IA HSB553 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2167
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2311
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2311
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an ex parte court order authorizing the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications by special state agents.
Title
A bill for an act relating to an ex parte court order authorizing the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications by special state agents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2018 11:30AM House Lounge |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Fisher and Kurth. H.J. 142. |
2018-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2167 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
HF2311 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
SSB3032 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2311 (Replaced by) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
SSB3032 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB553 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB553.html |