IA SF2167 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to an ex parte court order authorizing the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications by special state agents. (Formerly SSB 3032.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to an ex parte court order authorizing the interception of wire, oral, or electronic communications by special state agents. (Formerly SSB 3032.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592. |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 311. |
2018-02-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 299. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 369. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 1. S.J. 369. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 229. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 225. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3032 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB553 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2311 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.
HSB553 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2311 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 592.