IA HSB541 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2406
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to school corporations by changing the date of the election of directors of local school districts, merged areas, and area education agency boards and including applicability and transition provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to school corporations by changing the date of the election of directors of local school districts, merged areas, and area education agency boards and including applicability and transition provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2016-02-11 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge State Government. |
2016-01-26 | House | State Government: Vander Linden Chair,Hunter, and Pettengill. |
2016-01-26 | House | In State Government |
2016-01-26 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2406 (Replaced by) 2016-03-08 - Subcommittee, Danielson, Chapman, and Horn. S.J. 457.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB541 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB541.html |