IA HSB529 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2239
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2253
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2253
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 164.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the discovery of evidence in criminal cases involving victims of sexual abuse.(See HF 2239.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the discovery of evidence in criminal cases involving victims of sexual abuse.(See HF 2239.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 164. |
2022-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2022 1:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Westrich, Gustafson and Meyer, B. H.J. 53. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 49. |
2022-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3018 (Related) 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2253.
HF2239 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
SF2253 (Replaced by) 2022-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 632.
HF2239 (Replaced by) 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 939.
SF2253 (Replaced by) 2022-03-29 - Withdrawn. S.J. 632.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB529 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB529.html |