IA HSB503 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program fraud.
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. Vote Total: 0-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Bacon and Bennett. H.J. 51. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 46. |
2022-01-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB503 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB503.html |