IA HSB42 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF531
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 347.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning unemployment insurance and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act concerning unemployment insurance and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 347. |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2019 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Deyoe, Thompson, Running-Marquardt and Kurtz. H.J. 151. |
2019-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1086 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano and Brown.
HF531 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 1044.
HF531 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 1044.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB42 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB42.html |