IA HF531 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 1044.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 1044.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning unemployment insurance and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 42.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning unemployment insurance and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 42.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Senate amendment H-1312 filed. H.J. 1044. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1130. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 1127. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3230 filed, adopted. S.J. 1126. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3229 filed, adopted. S.J. 1126. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 931. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 850. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Brown, and Dotzler. S.J. 751. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 713. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 713. |
2019-03-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 616. |
2019-03-25 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 617. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed House, yeas 53, nays 44. H.J. 610. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 357. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB42 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 347.
SSB1086 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano and Brown.
SSB1086 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee: Chapman, Bisignano and Brown.