IA HSB277 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF615
Note: Legislation replaced by HF894
Note: Legislation replaced by HF894
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1077.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1077.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 894.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 894.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1077. |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 894. |
2021-05-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 05/06/2021 9:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Hall and Latham. H.J. 1043. |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1043. |
2021-05-05 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1275 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 615.
SF615 (Replaced by) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
HF894 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1195.
SF615 (Replaced by) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
HF894 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1195.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB277 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB277.html |