IA HF894 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 277.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly HSB 277.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1195. |
2021-05-19 | House | SF 615 substituted. H.J. 1194. |
2021-05-19 | House | Amendment H-1537 filed, adopted. H.J. 1194. |
2021-05-06 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2021-05-06 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1044. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1275 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 615.
SF615 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
HSB277 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1077.
SF615 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
HSB277 (Related) 2021-05-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1077.