IA HSB236 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF649
Note: Legislation replaced by SF519

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 418.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving trespass to agricultural production facilities, and providing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving trespass to agricultural production facilities, and providing penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 418.
2019-03-05HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-03-04HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 9:00AM RM 308.
2019-03-04HouseSubcommittee: Klein, Paustian and Bearinger. H.J. 393.
2019-03-04HouseBy COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

SSB1227 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF649 (Replaced by) 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 524.
SF519 (Replaced by) 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 639.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback