IA HF649 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 524.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving trespass to agricultural production facilities, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 236.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to an offense involving trespass to agricultural production facilities, and providing penalties. (Formerly HSB 236.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 524.
2019-03-12HouseSF 519 substituted. H.J. 522.
2019-03-12HouseAmendment H-1005 adopted. H.J. 522.
2019-03-11HouseFiscal note.
2019-03-07HouseAmendment H-1005 filed. H.J. 471.
2019-03-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 415.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1227 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB236 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 418.
SF519 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 639.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback