IA HSB207 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF596
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Local Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Voted - Local Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the grounds for refusing to renew a vehicle registration.
Title
A study bill relating to the grounds for refusing to renew a vehicle registration.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Voted - Local Government. |
2015-03-04 | House | 12:30PM; House Lounge Local Government. |
2015-03-02 | House | Local Government: Gassman Chair,Baxter, and Meyer. |
2015-03-02 | House | In Local Government |
2015-03-02 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF596 (Replaced by) 2015-04-03 - Referred to Local Government. H.J. 753.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB207.html |