IA HSB196 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF648
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to career and technical education programs and partnerships and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to career and technical education programs and partnerships and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-04-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/12/2017 8:00AM House Lounge |
2017-04-04 | House | Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Rogers and Bearinger. H.J. 898. |
2017-04-04 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
HF648 (Replaced by) 2018-04-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 882.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB196 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB196.html |