IA HSB180 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF638
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the secretary of state, including requirements for persons filing certain documents or records with the office of secretary of state, the use of certain fees associated with business filings, and the unauthorized filing of commercial records, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the secretary of state, including requirements for persons filing certain documents or records with the office of secretary of state, the use of certain fees associated with business filings, and the unauthorized filing of commercial records, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 983. |
2017-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2017 12:00PM House Lounge |
2017-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Nunn and Wolfe. H.J. 564. |
2017-03-07 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF638 (Replaced by) 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 20.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB180 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB180.html |