IA HSB18 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF113
Note: Legislation replaced by SF143
Note: Legislation replaced by SF143
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 180.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project for child welfare legal representation.(See HF 113.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state public defender pilot project for child welfare legal representation.(See HF 113.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 180. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Gustoff and Scheetz. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 93. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1015 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 143.
HF113 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.
SF143 (Replaced by) 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 483.
HF113 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 731.
SF143 (Replaced by) 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 483.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB18 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB18.html |