IA HSB175 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF686
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administering, prescribing, or ordering of immunizations or vaccines by a licensed podiatric physician, and providing an effective date.(See HF 686.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administering, prescribing, or ordering of immunizations or vaccines by a licensed podiatric physician, and providing an effective date.(See HF 686.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 686. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 534. |
2021-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2021 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2021-02-02 | House | Subcommittee: Bradley, Bacon and Sunde. H.J. 283. |
2021-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 282. |
2021-02-02 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF686 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee: Johnson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 592.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB175 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB175.html |