IA HSB164 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF740
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 550.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state budget process.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state budget process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 550. |
2019-02-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2019 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Hall and Sorensen. H.J. 290. |
2019-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
HF740 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 981.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB164 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB164.html |