IA HF740 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 981.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 981.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state budget process. (Formerly HSB 164.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state budget process. (Formerly HSB 164.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Breitbach, Bolkcom, and Kraayenbrink. S.J. 981. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 965. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 965. |
2019-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 858. |
2019-04-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 851. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 538. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB164 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 550.