IA HSB163 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF564
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Voted - Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the transfer of jurisdiction from the juvenile court to the district court related to a child in need of assistance case.
Title
A study bill relating to the transfer of jurisdiction from the juvenile court to the district court related to a child in need of assistance case.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Voted - Judiciary. |
2015-03-03 | House | 12:00PM; House Lounge Judiciary. |
2015-02-23 | House | Judiciary: Gustafson Chair,Dawson, and Rogers. |
2015-02-23 | House | In Judiciary |
2015-02-23 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1230 (Related) 2015-03-05 - Voted - Judiciary.
HF564 (Replaced by) 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 765.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 897.
HF564 (Replaced by) 2015-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 765.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 897.