IA HSB146 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF328
Note: Legislation replaced by HF506
Note: Legislation replaced by HF506
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Voted - State Government.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill related to absentee ballot deadlines.
Title
A study bill related to absentee ballot deadlines.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Voted - State Government. |
2015-03-02 | House | 12:30PM; House Lounge State Government. |
2015-02-17 | House | State Government: Stanerson Chair,Hein, and Hunter. |
2015-02-17 | House | In State Government |
2015-02-17 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1173 (Related) 2015-02-25 - Voted - State Government.
SF328 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 769.
HF506 (Replaced by) 2016-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Courtney, and Schultz. S.J. 62.
SF328 (Replaced by) 2015-04-02 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 769.
HF506 (Replaced by) 2016-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Courtney, and Schultz. S.J. 62.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB146 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB146.html |