IA SF328 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 769.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 769.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to absentee ballot deadlines. (Formerly SSB 1173.)
Title
A bill for an act related to absentee ballot deadlines. (Formerly SSB 1173.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 769. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3071 filed. S.J. 725. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 706. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 403. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 396. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF328 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF328.html |