IA HF506 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Courtney, and Schultz. S.J. 62.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Courtney, and Schultz. S.J. 62.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to absentee ballot deadlines. (Formerly HSB 146)
Title
A bill for an act related to absentee ballot deadlines. (Formerly HSB 146)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Danielson, Courtney, and Schultz. S.J. 62. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 1122. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 835. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3090 filed. S.J. 776. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 776. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Subcommittee, Danielson, McCoy, and Schultz. S.J. 592. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 560. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 560. |
2015-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 548. |
2015-03-12 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 577. |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 41. H.J. 544. |
2015-03-11 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 544. |
2015-03-11 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 544. |
2015-03-11 | House | Speaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 544. |
2015-03-11 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 544. |
2015-03-11 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 543. |
2015-03-11 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 543. |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1026 as amended, lost. H.J. 543. |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1037 to amendment H-1026 filed, adopted. H.J. 542. |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment H-1035 to amendment H-1026 withdrawn. H.J. 542. |
2015-03-10 | House | Amendment H-1035 filed. H.J. 537. |
2015-03-09 | House | Amendment H-1026 filed. H.J. 501. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 465. |