IA HSB12 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF262
Note: Legislation replaced by HF346
Note: Legislation replaced by HF346
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 346.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 346.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 346.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 346. |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 360. |
2023-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2023 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Kniff McCulla and Scholten. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Economic Growth and Technology. H.J. 92. |
2023-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON ECONOMIC GROWTH AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1071 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 262.
SF262 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
HF346 (Replaced by) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
SF262 (Replaced by) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.
HF346 (Replaced by) 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB12 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB12.html |