IA HF346 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Withdrawn. H.J. 653.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 12.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to consumer data protection, providing civil penalties, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 12.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-15HouseWithdrawn. H.J. 653.
2023-03-15HouseSF 262 substituted. H.J. 643.
2023-03-15HouseAmendment H-1093 adopted. H.J. 643.
2023-03-14HouseAmendment H-1093 filed. H.J. 622.
2023-03-09HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 596.
2023-02-20HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 368.

Same As/Similar To

HSB12 (Related) 2023-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 346.
SSB1071 (Related) 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 262.
SF262 (Similar To) 2023-03-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 719.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback