IA HF725 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 197; See HF 767.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 197; See HF 767.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 759. |
2019-04-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/04/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-18 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Carlson and Isenhart. H.J. 565. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 527. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB197 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 406.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF473 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
HF767 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF473 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
HF767 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF725 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF725.html |