IA SF473 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1208.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1208.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Brown, and Wahls. S.J. 520. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 475. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 473. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 465. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB197 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 406.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF725 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
HF767 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF725 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
HF767 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF473 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF473.html |