IA HF767 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 725 and HSB 197.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to motor vehicle taxes and fees, including registration fees for certain electric vehicles, an excise tax on hydrogen used as special fuel, and an excise tax on electricity used as electric fuel, providing penalties, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 725 and HSB 197.) Various effective dates, see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1084. |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1075. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1174. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 14. S.J. 1171. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3240 lost. S.J. 1170. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3240 filed. S.J. 1165. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Brown, and Wahls. S.J. 1044. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 996. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 996. |
2019-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 78 nays 20. H.J. 898. |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1237 adopted. H.J. 897. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1237 filed. H.J. 885. |
2019-04-10 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 754. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB197 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 406.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF473 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
HF725 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.
SSB1208 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF473 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Fiscal note.
HF725 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.