IA HF723 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 226; See HF 855.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 226; See HF 855.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 950. |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 855. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 832. |
2021-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-04 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Kurth and Lohse. H.J. 598. |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 573. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1040 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559.
HSB226 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 723.
SF559 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736.
HF855 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF589 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 928.
HSB226 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 723.
SF559 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736.
HF855 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF589 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 928.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF723 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF723.html |