IA SF559 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1040; See SF 589.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 1040; See SF 589.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2021 11:00AM RM 24A. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Petersen, and R. Smith. S.J. 591. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 532. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 525. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 520. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1040 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559.
HSB226 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 723.
HF723 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
HF855 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF589 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 928.
HSB226 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 723.
HF723 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
HF855 (Similar To) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF589 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 928.