IA HF855 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 723, HSB 226.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adoptee or an entitled person, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 723, HSB 226.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateSigned by Governor. H.J. 1201.
2021-05-19SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1200.
2021-04-28SenateMessage from House. S.J. 964.
2021-04-27HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1019.
2021-05-06HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1076.
2021-04-28HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1031.
2021-04-27HousePassed House, yeas 93 nays . H.J. 1017.
2021-04-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1410. H.J. 1016.
2021-04-22HouseSenate amendment H-1410 filed. H.J. 1001.
2021-04-22HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 999.
2021-04-21SenateImmediate message. S.J. 928.
2021-04-21SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 927.
2021-04-21SenateAmendment S-3164 filed, adopted. S.J. 927.
2021-04-21SenateSubstituted for SF 589. S.J. 927.
2021-04-14SenateRead first time, attached to companion SF 589. S.J. 878.
2021-04-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 878.
2021-04-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 950.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1173.
2021-04-22HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1000.
2021-04-21HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-13HousePassed House, yeas 91 nays none. H.J. 950.
2021-03-25HouseIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 834.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1040 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 559.
HSB226 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 723.
HF723 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 950.
SF559 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 736.
SF589 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 928.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback