IA HF712 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to a private right of action for certain consumer fraud violations and including an applicability provision. Effective 7-01-09.
Title
A bill for an act relating to a private right of action for certain consumer fraud violations and including an applicability provision. Effective 7-01-09.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-26 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 2130. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 2128. | |
2009-04-21 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1603. | |
2009-04-20 | Immediate message. S.J. 1152. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 1151. | |
2009-04-20 | Substituted for SF 178. S.J. 1151. | |
2009-04-20 | Attached to similar SF 178. S.J. 1150. | |
2009-04-20 | Message from House. S.J. 1150. | |
2009-04-20 | Immediate message. H.J. 1592. | |
2009-04-20 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1600. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 1592. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment H-1589 out of order. H.J. 1591. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendments H-1145, H-1155, H-1371, H-1375, H-1377, H-1445, H-1446, H-1468 and H-1588 out of order. H.J. 1591. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment H-1150 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1591. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendments H-1483 and H-1492 out of order. H.J. 1590. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment H-1642 adopted. H.J. 1590. | |
2009-04-20 | Amendment H-1642 filed. H.J. 1584. | |
2009-04-14 | Amendments H-1588 and H-1589 filed. H.J. 1451. | |
2009-04-09 | Amendment H-1492 filed. H.J. 1361. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 1357. | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment H-1483 filed. H.J. 1290. | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment H-1468 filed. H.J. 1252. | |
2009-04-07 | Amendments H-1445 and H-1446 filed. H.J. 1251. | |
2009-04-01 | Amendments H-1371, H-1375 and H-1377 filed. H.J. 1105. | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment H-1155 filed. H.J. 818. | |
2009-03-13 | Amendment H-1150 filed. H.J. 803. | |
2009-03-12 | Amendment H-1145 filed. H.J. 794. | |
2009-03-12 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 776. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=HF&key=0760C&ga=83 |