IA HF641 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1074.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 203.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 203.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1074. |
2017-04-18 | House | SF 510 substituted. H.J. 1066. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1381 filed, adopted. H.J. 1066. |
2017-04-18 | House | Asked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 1065. |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1013. |
2017-04-13 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1195 (Related) -
HSB203 (Related) 2017-04-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1016.
SF510 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
HSB203 (Related) 2017-04-14 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1016.
SF510 (Similar To) 2017-05-12 - NOBA: Graybook
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF641 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF641.html |