IA SF510 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1195.) Item veto. Various effective dates; see sections 25 and 35 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1195.) Item veto. Various effective dates; see sections 25 and 35 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateItem vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1137.
2017-04-25SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-25SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1063.
2017-04-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1074.
2017-04-18HousePassed House, ayes 58, nays 40. H.J. 1068.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1394 lost. H.J. 1067.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1394 filed. H.J. 1066.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1392 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1066.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1393 filed, lost. H.J. 1066.
2017-04-18HouseSubstituted for HF 641. H.J. 1066.
2017-04-18HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 1039.
2017-04-17HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1035.
2017-04-17SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1037.
2017-04-17SenatePassed Senate, ayes 29, nays 21. S.J. 1035.
2017-04-17SenateAmendment S-3323 filed, lost. S.J. 1035.
2017-04-17SenateAmendment S-3326 filed, adopted. S.J. 1035.
2017-04-13SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 1018.
2017-04-13SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1017.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback