IA HF64 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals.(See HF 303.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals.(See HF 303.)
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Thorup [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 303. |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 258. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 12:00PM House Lounge #2. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Steckman and Thorup. H.J. 118. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 92. |
Same As/Similar To
HF303 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF64 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF64.html |