IA HF303 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals.(Formerly HF 64.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confidential communications between a peer support group counselor and specified individuals.(Formerly HF 64.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 732. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Reichman, Kinney, and J. Taylor. S.J. 570. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 547. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 547. |
2021-03-08 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 630. |
2021-03-10 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays none. H.J. 624. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 243. |
Same As/Similar To
HF64 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 645.