IA HF636 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee: Holt, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 198.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Subcommittee: Holt, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 198.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons on school grounds, at places of employment, in buildings or physical structures located on property under the control of a political subdivision, and in county courthouses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 259.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the carrying, possession, or transportation of weapons on school grounds, at places of employment, in buildings or physical structures located on property under the control of a political subdivision, and in county courthouses, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 259.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Klein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 198. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 755. |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 409. |
Same As/Similar To
HF259 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 394.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF636 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF636.html |