IA HF635 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a license to practice podiatry. (Formerly HSB 221.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for a license to practice podiatry. (Formerly HSB 221.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015. |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1014. |
2023-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 907. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 940. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 938. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 747. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 718. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2023 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Koelker, Jochum, and Salmon. S.J. 646. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 574. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 574. |
2023-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 620. |
2023-03-15 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 617. |
2023-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1082 adopted. H.J. 617. |
2023-03-13 | House | Amendment H-1082 filed. H.J. 601. |
2023-03-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 503. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB221 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 635.