IA HF621 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers. (Formerly HSB 116.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm, firearm accessory, and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers. (Formerly HSB 116.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Shall amendment H–1218 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - Shall amendment H–1216 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - Shall amendment H–1215 be adopted? (Y: 39 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-02HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 884.
2021-04-02HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 884.
2021-03-23HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 765.
2021-03-22SenateImmediate message. S.J. 652.
2021-03-22SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17. S.J. 651.
2021-03-22SenateSubstituted for SF 514. S.J. 650.
2021-03-18SenateRead first time, attached to similar SF 514. S.J. 637.
2021-03-18SenateMessage from House. S.J. 637.
2021-03-17HouseImmediate message. H.J. 753.
2021-03-23HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 777.
2021-03-17HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 754.
2021-03-17HousePassed House, yeas 60, nays 37. H.J. 748.
2021-03-23HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 777.
2021-03-17HouseAmendment H-1218 lost. H.J. 747.
2021-03-23HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 777.
2021-03-17HouseAmendment H-1216 lost. H.J. 746.
2021-03-23HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 777.
2021-03-17HouseAmendment H-1215 lost. H.J. 745.
2021-03-16HouseAmendments H-1215, H-1216 and H-1218 filed. H.J. 739.
2021-02-22HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 495.

Same As/Similar To

HSB116 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 621.
SF344 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500.
SF514 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 651.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback