IA SF344 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers.(See SF 514.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers.(See SF 514.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 8:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Zaun. S.J. 390. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 328. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB116 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 621.
HF621 (Similar To) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
SF514 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 651.
HF621 (Similar To) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
SF514 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 651.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF344 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF344.html |