IA SF514 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers.(Formerly SF 344.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing which actions may be brought against firearm and ammunition manufacturers, distributors, importers, trade associations, sellers, or dealers.(Formerly SF 344.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 651. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | HF 621 substituted. S.J. 650. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3086 filed, adopted. S.J. 650. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 621. S.J. 637. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 500. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB116 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 621.
SF344 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500.
HF621 (Similar To) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.
SF344 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 514. S.J. 500.
HF621 (Similar To) 2021-04-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 884.