IA HF602 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chelgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chelgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 69.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing an exemption to an education requirement for certain children’s residential facilities, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 186.)
Title
A bill for an act providing an exemption to an education requirement for certain children’s residential facilities, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 186.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chelgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 69. |
2017-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 1134. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time and attached to similar SF 443. S.J. 778. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 778. |
2017-03-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2017-03-28 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 803. |
2017-03-27 | House | Passed House, ayes 58, nays 40. H.J. 783. |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 697. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1114 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF443 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chelgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 68.
HSB186 (Related) 2017-03-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 680.
SF443 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chelgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 68.
HSB186 (Related) 2017-03-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 680.