IA HF585 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment and implementation of the safe and sound program within the department of public safety, to participation in or use of the program by schools and students, to immunity from civil or criminal liability arising from a report made pursuant to the program, and to a safe and sound revolving fund, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 76.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment and implementation of the safe and sound program within the department of public safety, to participation in or use of the program by schools and students, to immunity from civil or criminal liability arising from a report made pursuant to the program, and to a safe and sound revolving fund, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 76.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-09 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-08 | House | Amendment H-1150 filed. H.J. 647. |
2021-02-17 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 448. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB76 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 585.
SSB1070 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
SSB1070 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.