IA HSB76 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF585
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 585.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the establishment and implementation of the safe and sound program within the department of public safety, to participation in or use of the program by schools and students, to immunity from civil or criminal liability arising from a report made pursuant to the program, and to a safe and sound revolving fund, and providing penalties.(See HF 585.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the establishment and implementation of the safe and sound program within the department of public safety, to participation in or use of the program by schools and students, to immunity from civil or criminal liability arising from a report made pursuant to the program, and to a safe and sound revolving fund, and providing penalties.(See HF 585.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 585. |
2021-02-16 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 440. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2021 4:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Gobble, Paustian and Steckman. H.J. 120. |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 117. |
2021-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1070 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 3:00PM RM 24A.
HF585 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
HF585 (Replaced by) 2021-04-15 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 965.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB76 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB76.html |