IA HF553 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 996.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 996.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of an agricultural theft surcharge on criminal offenses involving the theft of crops, livestock, or honeybees, and making an appropriation. (Formerly HSB 82; See HF 742.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of an agricultural theft surcharge on criminal offenses involving the theft of crops, livestock, or honeybees, and making an appropriation. (Formerly HSB 82; See HF 742.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 996. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 550. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Worthan, Breckenridge and Mommsen. H.J. 400. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 374. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB82 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 354.
HF742 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF742 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF553 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF553.html |