IA HF544 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act regarding the use of waste conversion technologies as a waste management practice. Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act regarding the use of waste conversion technologies as a waste management practice. Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - Passed House (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1187. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1186. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1051. |
2015-06-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1117. |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed House, ayes 90, nays none. H.J. 1116. |
2015-06-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1364. H.J. 1116. |
2015-05-14 | House | Senate amendment H-1364 filed. H.J. 1071. |
2015-05-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1070. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1030. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 2. S.J. 1029. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Amendment S-3149 adopted. S.J. 1029. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Amendment S-3149 filed. S.J. 956. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 835. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 755. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Ragan, and Rozenboom. S.J. 681. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 663. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 663. |
2015-03-19 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 659. |
2015-03-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 690. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 653. |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 492. |