IA HF517 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to offensive and dangerous weapons, and the justifiable use of reasonable and deadly force, including carrying, possessing, transferring, and acquiring weapons, the purchase and regulation of such weapons, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 133.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 28, 29, Division VI and section 51 effective 4-13-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to offensive and dangerous weapons, and the justifiable use of reasonable and deadly force, including carrying, possessing, transferring, and acquiring weapons, the purchase and regulation of such weapons, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 133.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 28, 29, Division VI and section 51 effective 4-13-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13SenateSigned by Governor. H.J. 1009.
2017-04-12SenateSent to Governor. H.J. 996.
2017-04-12SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 996.
2017-04-07SenateMessage from House. S.J. 929.
2017-04-06HouseImmediate message. H.J. 918.
2017-04-06HousePassed House, ayes 57, nays 36. H.J. 917.
2017-04-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1297. H.J. 917.
2017-04-06HouseSpeaker ruled point not well taken. H.J. 917.
2017-04-06HousePoint of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 917.
2017-04-06HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 916.
2017-04-06HouseMotion to suspend rules to consider H-1311 to Senate amendment H-1297. H.J. 916.
2017-04-06HousePoint of order raised on H-1311 to Senate amendment H-1297, ruled not germane. H.J. 915.
2017-04-06HouseAmendment H-1311 to Senate amendment H-1297 filed. H.J. 915.
2017-04-04HouseSenate amendment H-1297 filed. H.J. 881.
2017-04-04HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 868.
2017-04-04SenateImmediate message. S.J. 876.
2017-04-04SenatePassed Senate, ayes 33, nays 17. S.J. 875.
2017-04-04SenateAmendment S-3282 filed, lost. S.J. 875.
2017-04-04SenateAmendment S-3275 adopted, as amended. S.J. 874.
2017-04-04SenateAmendment S-3284 filed, lost. S.J. 873.
2017-04-04SenateAmendment S-3285 filed, adopted. S.J. 873.
2017-04-04SenateAmendment S-3275 filed. S.J. 873.
2017-04-04SenateDeferred. S.J. 864.
2017-03-16SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 662.
2017-03-09SenateSubcommittee: Dawson, Petersen, and Zaun. S.J. 559.
2017-03-08SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 517.
2017-03-08SenateMessage from House. S.J. 517.
2017-03-07HouseImmediate message. H.J. 540.
2017-03-08HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 563.
2017-03-08HouseExplanation of vote H-1157 to H-1152, H-1156 to H-1152, H-1152, as amended and H-1150 H.J. 563.
2017-03-07HousePassed House, ayes 58, nays 39. H.J. 540.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1149 lost. H.J. 539.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1150 lost. H.J. 538.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1153 adopted. H.J. 538.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1147 lost. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1151 withdrawn. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseSpeaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HousePoint of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1148 lost. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1146 out of order. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1152 adopted, as amended. H.J. 537.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1156 to H-1152 filed, adopted. H.J. 536.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1157 to H-1152 lost. H.J. 535.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1157 to H-1152 filed. H.J. 534.
2017-03-06HouseAmendments H-1149, H-1150, H-1151, H-1152 and H-1153 filed. H.J. 518.
2017-03-06HouseAmendments H-1146, H-1147 and H-1148 filed. H.J. 517.
2017-03-02HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 503.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF517
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF517.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Reprinted/HF517.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/enrolled/HF517.html
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/hjweb/pdf/March%2007,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/April%2004,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/hjweb/pdf/April%2006,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20170307_HJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20170404_SJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20170406_HJNL.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback