IA HSB133 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF517
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to offensive and dangerous weapons, and the justifiable use of reasonable and deadly force, including carrying, possessing, transferring, and acquiring weapons, the purchase and regulation of such weapons, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to offensive and dangerous weapons, and the justifiable use of reasonable and deadly force, including carrying, possessing, transferring, and acquiring weapons, the purchase and regulation of such weapons, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 506. |
2017-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl, Heartsill and Wolfe. H.J. 429. |
2017-02-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF517 (Replaced by) 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB133.html |