IA HF515 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an alternatives to abortion program, and making an appropriation.
Title
A bill for an act creating an alternatives to abortion program, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2021 12:30PM RM 19. |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Boden and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 394. |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 390. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF515 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF515.html |