IA HF498 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 122.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 122.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state taxes by eliminating the individual income tax, increasing the sales and use tax rates, making conforming changes, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state taxes by eliminating the individual income tax, increasing the sales and use tax rates, making conforming changes, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hagenow, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 122. |
2019-02-26 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl, Hein and Jacoby. H.J. 362. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 342. |
Same As/Similar To
SF182 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee: Feenstra, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 247.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF498 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF498.html |