IA HF475 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1009.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the use of a straight wall cartridge rifle to hunt deer and including penalties. (Formerly HF 210.) Effective 7-1-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the use of a straight wall cartridge rifle to hunt deer and including penalties. (Formerly HF 210.) Effective 7-1-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1009.
2017-04-11HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 981.
2017-04-11HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981.
2017-04-03HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 828.
2017-04-03SenateImmediate message. S.J. 849.
2017-04-03SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 857.
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 848.
2017-04-03SenateAmendment S-3273 filed, lost. S.J. 847.
2017-03-21SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 720.
2017-03-16SenateSubcommittee: Rozenboom, Greene, and Kinney. S.J. 661.
2017-03-14SenateRead first time, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 586.
2017-03-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 586.
2017-03-13HouseImmediate message. H.J. 624.
2017-03-13HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 755.
2017-03-13HousePassed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 617.
2017-03-13HouseAmendment H-1113 adopted. H.J. 616.
2017-03-01HouseAmendment H-1113 filed. H.J. 496.
2017-02-28HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 479.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback